NJ S1541 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A965
Note: Carry Foward to future S2205
Note: Carry Over of previous A527
Note: Carry Over of previous S1455
Note: Carry Foward to future S2205
Note: Carry Over of previous A527
Note: Carry Over of previous S1455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides discounted hunting and trapping license, permit, and stamp fees for senior citizens.
Title
Provides discounted hunting and trapping license, permit, and stamp fees for senior citizens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1541 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1541 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A605 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A527 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1455 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1541 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A605 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A527 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1455 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1541 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1541_I1.HTM |