NJ S1530 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires governmental affairs agents retained by government entities to file certain reports with ELEC; requires certain government entities retaining governmental affairs agents to file annual reports with ELEC.
Title
Requires governmental affairs agents retained by government entities to file certain reports with ELEC; requires certain government entities retaining governmental affairs agents to file annual reports with ELEC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1530 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1003 (Same As) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1003 (Same As) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading