NJ S1512 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S534
Note: Carry Over of previous A4582
Note: Carry Over of previous S2978

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOE to maintain list of textbook vendors that use inclusive material and school districts to use textbooks from those vendors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOE to maintain list of textbook vendors that use inclusive material and school districts to use textbooks from those vendors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1512 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3052 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4582 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2978 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback