NJ S1503 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S2125
Note: Carry Over of previous A1750

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A1507 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits chair or booth rentals for the purpose of providing cosmetology and hairstyling services or ancillary services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits chair or booth rentals for the purpose of providing cosmetology and hairstyling services or ancillary services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-21SenateSubstituted by A1507 (3R)
2023-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-02-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1507 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.231.
S2125 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1750 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback