NJ S1497 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.188.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Killed in Action flag as an official State flag; mandates it be displayed at certain public buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates Killed in Action flag as an official State flag; mandates it be displayed at certain public buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3225 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.188.
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted for A3225
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-06-09SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3304 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3225 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S1497

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback