NJ S1486 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4013

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits sale of expanded polystyrene food containers by public schools and public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits sale of expanded polystyrene food containers by public schools and public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A909 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4013 (Carry Over) 2017-01-19 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback