NJ S1481 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1302
Note: Carry Foward to future S2903
Note: Carry Over of previous S3898
Note: Carry Over of previous A5455
Note: Carry Foward to future S2903
Note: Carry Over of previous S3898
Note: Carry Over of previous A5455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates sale of handgun ammunition and develops system for electronic reporting of firearm information.
Title
Regulates sale of handgun ammunition and develops system for electronic reporting of firearm information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1481 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1481 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1292 (Same As) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3898 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5455 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1481 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1292 (Same As) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3898 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5455 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1481 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1481_I1.HTM |