NJ S1472 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S703
Note: Carry Foward to future A3141
Note: Carry Over of previous S1276
Note: Carry Foward to future A3141
Note: Carry Over of previous S1276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit disadvantaged or minority men to teach in certain failing schools under alternate route program.
Title
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit disadvantaged or minority men to teach in certain failing schools under alternate route program.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1472 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1472 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1439 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1276 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S1472 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1439 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1276 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading