NJ S1429 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4846

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1053
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises and expands laws on trespass and vandalism on agricultural and horticultural lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises and expands laws on trespass and vandalism on agricultural and horticultural lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A1053
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1053 (Same As) 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.121.
A4846 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback