NJ S1428 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A784

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes multi-species depredation permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes multi-species depredation permit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateTransferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A784 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A784 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback