NJ S1418 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1598
Note: Carry Over of previous A168
Note: Carry Over of previous A168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Sunday bow hunting on federal military installations and William J. Hughes Technical Center.
Title
Authorizes Sunday bow hunting on federal military installations and William J. Hughes Technical Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A135 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1598 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A168 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1598 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A168 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1418 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1418_I1.HTM |