NJ S1403 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1454
Note: Carry Over of previous A5517
Note: Carry Over of previous A5517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program authorizing lease of historic buildings and structures in State parks, forests, and wildlife management areas.
Title
Establishes program authorizing lease of historic buildings and structures in State parks, forests, and wildlife management areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1454 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3221 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A5517 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A3221 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A5517 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1403 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1403_I1.HTM |