NJ S1400 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1737

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes task force to study issues facing returning members of US Armed Forces, NJ National Guard, and reserve component of US Armed Forces; creates permanent commission to study various definitions related to veteran status.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes task force to study issues facing returning members of US Armed Forces, NJ National Guard, and reserve component of US Armed Forces; creates permanent commission to study various definitions related to veteran status.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2020-07-30SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1737 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback