NJ S1397 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4493

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Garden State Young Farmers Loan Redemption Program in Higher Education Student Assistance Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Garden State Young Farmers Loan Redemption Program in Higher Education Student Assistance Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A807 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4493 (Carry Over) 2017-01-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback