NJ S1394 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A719
Note: Carry Foward to future S1696
Note: Carry Over of previous A976
Note: Carry Over of previous S1416
Note: Carry Foward to future S1696
Note: Carry Over of previous A976
Note: Carry Over of previous S1416
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Caps State use portion of energy tax revenues and ensures balance of such revenues are paid annually as municipal aid.
Title
Caps State use portion of energy tax revenues and ensures balance of such revenues are paid annually as municipal aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1394 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1394 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A788 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A976 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1416 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1394 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A788 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A976 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1416 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1394 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1394_I1.HTM |