NJ S1373 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3096

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands option of governmental home health care agency to partner with non-governmental providers to deliver health care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands option of governmental home health care agency to partner with non-governmental providers to deliver health care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3207 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A3207
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3207 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1373
S3096 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback