NJ S1367 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Substituted by A2158 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows member of PFRS who is police chief and fire department chief to serve until age 67 under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows member of PFRS who is police chief and fire department chief to serve until age 67 under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateSubstituted by A2158 (1R)
2022-03-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-02-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2158 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - Approved P.L.2022, c.9.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback