NJ S1364 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides funding from the General Fund to the Greater Wildwoods Tourism Improvement and Development Authority; appropriates $4 million.*
Title
Provides funding from the General Fund to the Greater Wildwoods Tourism Improvement and Development Authority; appropriates $4 million.*
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3869 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3869 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-24-1) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A3869 (2R) |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3869 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1364 (2R)