NJ S136 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2231
Note: Carry Foward to future S318
Note: Carry Over of previous S1933
Note: Carry Over of previous A1412
Note: Carry Foward to future S318
Note: Carry Over of previous S1933
Note: Carry Over of previous A1412
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes annual cost of living adjustment based on Consumer Price Index for certain children, youth, and family services organizations.
Title
Establishes annual cost of living adjustment based on Consumer Price Index for certain children, youth, and family services organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S136 (Carry Over) 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S136 (Carry Over) 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1933 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1412 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1456 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S136 (Carry Over) 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1933 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1412 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1456 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee