NJ S1305 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S126

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain applicants to submit personal statement of veteran status, in lieu of determination of veteran status, prior to issuance of civil service eligible list; requires submission of determination of status prior to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain applicants to submit personal statement of veteran status, in lieu of determination of veteran status, prior to issuance of civil service eligible list; requires submission of determination of status prior to employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S126 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4140 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback