NJ S1262 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S402
Note: Carry Over of previous S871
Note: Carry Over of previous S2358
Note: Carry Over of previous A2230
Note: Carry Over of previous S871
Note: Carry Over of previous S2358
Note: Carry Over of previous A2230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits retail mercantile establishments from requiring certain consumer identification for return of merchandise.
Title
Prohibits retail mercantile establishments from requiring certain consumer identification for return of merchandise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1262 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S871 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2358 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2230 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S871 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2358 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2230 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1262 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1262_I1.HTM |