NJ S1246 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires NJTA to implement certain roadside maintenance safety policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires NJTA to implement certain roadside maintenance safety policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4588 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-1)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A4588
2018-12-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4588 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1246

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback