NJ S123 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3064
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-04 - Approved P.L.2016, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-04 - Approved P.L.2016, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Small Business Bonding Readiness Assistance Program" in EDA to assist certain small businesses meet State or federal contract surety bond requirements.*
Title
Establishes "Small Business Bonding Readiness Assistance Program" in EDA to assist certain small businesses meet State or federal contract surety bond requirements.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3559 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-04 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.84. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A3559 (1R) |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Pennacchio) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3064 (Carry Over) 2015-09-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3559 (Same As) 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S123 (2R)
A3559 (Same As) 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S123 (2R)