NJ S1228 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1723
Note: Carry Foward to future A3955
Note: Carry Over of previous S518
Note: Carry Foward to future A3955
Note: Carry Over of previous S518
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to conduct study to determine extent and cause of outmigration of high school graduates to out-of-State colleges.
Title
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to conduct study to determine extent and cause of outmigration of high school graduates to out-of-State colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1228 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1228 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S518 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5412 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1228 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S518 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5412 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee