NJ S1225 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2770
Note: Carry Over of previous S4187
Note: Carry Over of previous A6064
Note: Carry Over of previous S4187
Note: Carry Over of previous A6064
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipality to return to taxpayer property taxes paid in error due to assessor's or owner's mistake.
Title
Requires municipality to return to taxpayer property taxes paid in error due to assessor's or owner's mistake.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1225 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1314 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4187 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A6064 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1314 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4187 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A6064 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee