NJ S1219 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.186.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires reporting of suspected abuse of institutionalized elderly to police and that facility employees receive notice of reporting requirement annually; designated as "Peggy's Law."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires reporting of suspected abuse of institutionalized elderly to police and that facility employees receive notice of reporting requirement annually; designated as "Peggy's Law."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A936 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.186.
2017-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2017-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A936 (2R)
2017-06-26AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2017-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S505 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A936 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S1219 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback