NJ S1214 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2373

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3797 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (52-24-0)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A3797 (2R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-20AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (28-10)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-17SenateTransferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2373 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3797 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1214 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback