NJ S1211 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S982
Note: Carry Over of previous A2038

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for civil actions against persons or entities profiting from commission of human trafficking offenses, or maintaining victims of such offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for civil actions against persons or entities profiting from commission of human trafficking offenses, or maintaining victims of such offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1222 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08AssemblyApproved P.L.2023, c.208.
2023-12-07AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2023-12-07AssemblySubstituted for A1222
2023-12-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2023-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2023-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2022-02-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1222 (Same As) 2023-12-07 - Substituted by S1211
S982 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2038 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback