NJ S1176 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2506

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns speech rights of student journalists at public schools and public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns speech rights of student journalists at public schools and public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A238 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2506 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback