NJ S1163 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1807
Note: Carry Over of previous A1266
Note: Carry Over of previous A1266
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Approved P.L.2020, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-24 - Approved P.L.2020, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement officers to wear body cameras.
Title
Requires law enforcement officers to wear body cameras.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4271 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4271 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.128. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-15-6) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (32-0) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-18-5) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A4271 (1R) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKnight) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-2) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading w/o recommendation |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1807 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4271 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S1163 (2R)
A1266 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4271 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S1163 (2R)
A1266 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee