NJ S1150 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3211

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes DCA to establish flexible multiple dwelling inspection schedule; requires multiple dwelling owners to file certain registrations. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes DCA to establish flexible multiple dwelling inspection schedule; requires multiple dwelling owners to file certain registrations. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5041 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-1)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A5041 (1R)
2019-05-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3211 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5041 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1150 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback