NJ S1149 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1155
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2877 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2877 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns municipal property registration ordinances to address risk of blight.
Title
Concerns municipal property registration ordinances to address risk of blight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A2877 (2R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1155 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5084 (1R)
A2877 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.444.
A2877 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.444.