NJ S1139 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S1243

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides tax credit to long-term care facilities that pay for training and certification of certified nurse aide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides tax credit to long-term care facilities that pay for training and certification of certified nurse aide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2022-03-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-01-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1243 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2766 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback