NJ S1111 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S149

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises criteria to establish base year for homestead property tax reimbursement after relocation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises criteria to establish base year for homestead property tax reimbursement after relocation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A406 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S149 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback