NJ S1106 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3584
Note: Legislation replaced by S2347
Note: Legislation replaced by S2347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Combined with S2347 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Combined with S2347 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns development and use of accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerns development and use of accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Combined with S2347 (SCS) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3584 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2792 (Same As) 2025-02-10 - Committee Substitute but not reported
S2347 (Replaced by) 2025-02-25 - Senate Substitution (35-1) (Singleton)
A2792 (Same As) 2025-02-10 - Committee Substitute but not reported
S2347 (Replaced by) 2025-02-25 - Senate Substitution (35-1) (Singleton)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1106 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1500/1106_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1106 |