NJ S1093 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4386
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Approved P.L.2018, c.141.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Approved P.L.2018, c.141.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Nosey's Law"; prohibits use of wild or exotic animals in traveling animal acts.
Title
"Nosey's Law"; prohibits use of wild or exotic animals in traveling animal acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1923 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1923 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.141. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-3-3) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A1923 (2R) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1923 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S1093 (2R)
A4386 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2508 (1R)
A4386 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2508 (1R)