NJ S1041 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2841
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to develop timeline for use by individuals with developmental disabilities to gain benefit of State and federal programs; requires posting timeline on DHS, DCF, and DOE websites.
Title
Requires DHS to develop timeline for use by individuals with developmental disabilities to gain benefit of State and federal programs; requires posting timeline on DHS, DCF, and DOE websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1449 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.72. |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1449 |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1449 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by S1041
A2841 (Carry Over) 2014-10-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2841 (Carry Over) 2014-10-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading