NJ S1036 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2469

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.1.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-34-1)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A3115
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (26-11)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
A3115 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1036

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback