NJ S1017 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4297
Note: Carry Over of previous A6024
Note: Carry Over of previous A6024
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides retirement allowance after 20 years of service regardless of age for current members of PFRS who retire within two years.
Title
Provides retirement allowance after 20 years of service regardless of age for current members of PFRS who retire within two years.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2562 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2562 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.52. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-3) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for A2562 (1R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4297 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2562 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S1017 (1R)
A6024 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2562 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S1017 (1R)
A6024 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee