NJ AR98 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AR86
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares week of September 22 through September 28, 2024 as "Diaper Need Awareness Week."
Title
Declares week of September 22 through September 28, 2024 as "Diaper Need Awareness Week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR86 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SR103 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR103 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/AR98 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/AR/98_I1.HTM |