NJ AR87 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports participation of Republic of China (Taiwan) as observer in United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change (UNFCCC) and in International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO).
Title
Supports participation of Republic of China (Taiwan) as observer in United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change (UNFCCC) and in International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-14 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Assembly (66-9-0) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/AR87 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/AR/87_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR87 |