NJ AR193 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges federal government to raise state and local tax deduction to $25,000.
Title
Urges federal government to raise state and local tax deduction to $25,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (71-0-1) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR97 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AR193 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AR/193_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR193 |