NJ AR160 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Affirming historical connection of Jewish people to Jerusalem; condemns efforts by United Nations Educational, Scientific, and Cultural Organization to deny Jews' historical, religious, and cultural ties to Jerusalem.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affirming historical connection of Jewish people to Jerusalem; condemns efforts by United Nations Educational, Scientific, and Cultural Organization to deny Jews' historical, religious, and cultural ties to Jerusalem.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2018-06-21AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-06-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

SR78 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback