NJ AR145 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR76
Note: Carry Foward to future AR131
Note: Carry Foward to future AR131
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates New Jersey -Taiwan sister state relationship and recognizes importance of strong and enduring partnership between New Jersey and Taiwan.
Title
Commemorates New Jersey -Taiwan sister state relationship and recognizes importance of strong and enduring partnership between New Jersey and Taiwan.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Resolution Passed Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
AR145 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR145 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR108 (Same As) 2021-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AR145 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR108 (Same As) 2021-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee