NJ AR125 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AR43
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress and President of United States to eliminate funding disparities among land-grant institutions of higher education.
Title
Urges Congress and President of United States to eliminate funding disparities among land-grant institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (71-0-4) |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR43 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AR125 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AR/125_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR125 |