NJ AJR85 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR40
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first full day of spring of each year as "New Jersey Agriculture Day."
Title
Designates first full day of spring of each year as "New Jersey Agriculture Day."
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (63-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR85 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR72 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR72 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR85 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/85_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR85 |