NJ AJR83 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR131
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR18
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR35
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR18
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR35
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Caregivers Awareness Month."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Caregivers Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR83 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR83 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR35 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR153 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR83 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR35 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR153 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR83 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/83_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR83 |