NJ AJR63 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by SJR56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes 70th anniversary of establishment of State of Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes 70th anniversary of establishment of State of Israel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted by SJR56
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR56 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-5.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback