NJ AJR54 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR64
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR213
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR143
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR213
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR143
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Stroke Awareness Month."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Stroke Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR54 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR213 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR96 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR143 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR213 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SJR96 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR143 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee