NJ AJR44 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous AJR108
Note: Carryover of previous AJR108

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates June 4 of each year as "Tourette Syndrome Awareness Day" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates June 4 of each year as "Tourette Syndrome Awareness Day" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR108 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
AJR108 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR16 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback